Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2759035

EP2759035 - IN-VEHICLE CHARGING CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen BYD Auto R&D Company Limited
Part B, 1/F, Bldg Nº B2, Yucan Industrial Area
Lanzhu Road, Shenzhen Export Processing Zone
Shenzhen Grand Industrial Zone
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN
For all designated states
BYD Company Limited
No. 3009, BYD Road
Pingshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Yu
No. 3009 BYD Road
Pingshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN
02 / ZHOU, Lianwen
No. 3009 BYD Road
Pingshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2014/31]
Application number, filing date12833437.221.09.2012
WO2012CN81772
Priority number, dateCN20111028226322.09.2011         Original published format: CN201110282263
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013041049
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2759035
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN28.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, G06F1/24, G06F1/26, B60L11/18, H01R13/66
[2016/47]
Former International [2014/31]H02J7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGINTERNE LADUNGSKONTROLLVORRICHTUNG, LADESYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND FAHRZEUG[2014/31]
English:IN-VEHICLE CHARGING CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM AND VEHICLE[2014/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE EMBARQUÉ, SYSTÈME DE CHARGE DE VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE ASSOCIÉ[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2014National basic fee paid 
15.04.2014Search fee paid 
15.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
08.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[IA]WO2010150360  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,6-9 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0185]; figures 1-25 * [A] 3-5;
 [A]US2010293302  (FUJII DAISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-5 *;
 [I]CN201985831U  (SHENZHEN INNOTECH ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - EV CHARGING SYSTEMS COMMITEE, "(R) SAE Electric Vehicle Conductive Charge Coupler J1772", vol. J1772, no. REV. NOV2001, (19961001), pages 1 - 32, 19961001, URL: http://bzwxw.com/soft/UploadSoft/new5/SAE--J1772-2001.pdf, (20120102), XP002666503 [A] 1-9 * page 6, paragraph 4.1 - page 8, paragraph 5.1; figures 2, 3, 4, 5 * * page 11, paragraph 5.4 * * page 30; figure B1 *
International search[XP]CN102624038  (BYD CO LTD);
 [A]CN201146378Y  (BYD CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN2922242Y  (WANG LIANFA [CN]);
 [A]CN201854075U  (YONGJI XINSHISU ELECTRIC EQUIP);
 [A]US2005253561  (TIBBS BOBBY L [US]);
 [A]US5596258  (KIMURA TAKASHI [JP], et al)
by applicantWO2010150360