Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2759642

EP2759642 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY AND BATTERY PACK THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, PT
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
16-1, Higashiueno 2-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-0015 / JP
[2018/46]
Former [2014/31]For all designated states
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
5-1 Koraku 2-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112-8563 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / INOUE Takeshi
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / FUTAMI Motoo
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
03 / TAKEUCHI Ken
c/o Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
Tsuchiura Works
Intellectual Property Department
650 Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
04 / SAKABE Kei
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
 [2018/46]
Former [2014/31]01 / INOUE Takeshi
c/o Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / FUTAMI Motoo
c/o Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
03 / TAKEUCHI Ken
c/o Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd.
Tsuchiura Works
Intellectual Property Department
650 Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
04 / SAKABE Kei
c/o Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2018/45]
Former [2014/31]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12833725.015.08.2012
[2018/45]
WO2012JP70753
Priority number, dateJP2011020810222.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011208102
[2014/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013042495
Date:28.03.2013
Language:JA
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2759642
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2759642
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/45]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2759642
Date:12.12.2018
[2018/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:E02F9/00, E02F9/26, H01M10/48, H01M10/42, H02J7/00, B60L11/18, E02F9/20
[2018/22]
Former International [2014/31]E02F9/00, E02F9/26, H01M10/48, H02J7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BAUMASCHINE UND BATTERIEPACKUNG DAFÜR[2014/31]
English:CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY AND BATTERY PACK THEREFOR[2014/31]
French:MACHINERIE DE CONSTRUCTION ET BLOC BATTERIE ASSOCIÉ[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2014Translation filed 
07.03.2014National basic fee paid 
07.03.2014Search fee paid 
07.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
29.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2018Fee for grant paid
26.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.11.2018
AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
PT07.03.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/25]AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
RS07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
SE07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
GR08.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT07.11.2018
ES07.11.2018
FI07.11.2018
HR07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
LV07.11.2018
NL07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
BG07.02.2019
NO07.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI07.11.2018
LT07.11.2018
NO07.02.2019
IS07.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT07.11.2018
NO07.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2007288894  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0039] - [0071] - [0084]; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [Y]US2004005497  (NUNOMAKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0083] *;
 [A]US5248929  (BURKE TIMOTHY M [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006006842  (MISKOVIC IGOR [SE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6947035  (SHIRAGA SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006015758  (YOON SUNG-MIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2007288894  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY);
 [A]JPH0621867  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD);
 [A]JP2005536172  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB.)
by applicantJP2009197514
 JPH08201488
 JPH06242193