EP2758389 - PYRAZOLE CARBOXAMIDES AS JANUS KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUBAKER, Jason Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 02 /
CLOSE, Joshua Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 03 /
SIU, Tony Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Graham Frank Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 05 /
TORRES, Luis E. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 06 /
WOO, Hyun Chong Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 07 /
YOUNG, Jonathan R. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 08 /
WEI, Zhongyong Pharmaron Beijing, Co., Ltd. 6 Taihe Road Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 09 /
SHI, Feng Pharmaron Beijing, Co., Ltd. 6 Taihe Road Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Jaap, David Robert Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Jaap, David Robert Merck & Co., Inc. Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12834277.1 | 21.09.2012 | [2017/23] | WO2012CN81723 | Priority number, date | US201161537978P | 22.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161537978 P | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013041042 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758389 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2758389 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D405/04, C07D405/14, C07D409/04, C07D409/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/4155, A61K31/4439, A61K31/541, A61P11/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
C07D405/08 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D231/38 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/08 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Title | German: | PYRAZOLCARBOXAMIDE ALS JANUSKINASEINHIBITOREN | [2014/31] | English: | PYRAZOLE CARBOXAMIDES AS JANUS KINASE INHIBITORS | [2014/31] | French: | CARBOXAMIDES DE PYRAZOLE COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA JANUS KINASE | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 29.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2012 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IE | 21.09.2017 | LU | 21.09.2017 | MT | 21.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 21.09.2012 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.09.2012 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.09.2012 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.09.2012 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
MT | 21.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010014453 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2009114512 (INCYTE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim 1 *; | [A] - KISS R ET AL, "Recent developments on JAK2 inhibitors: a patent review", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, INFORMA HEALTHCARE, GB, (20100401), vol. 20, no. 4, doi:10.1517/13543771003639436, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 471 - 495, XP001539996 [A] 1-15 * figure 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543771003639436 | International search | [A]WO2008132502 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2011028685 (INCYTE CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2011112662 (INCYTE CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2010135650 (INCYTE CORP [US], et al); | [A]WO2011075334 (PFIZER [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010014453 | US4256108 | US4166452 | US4265874 | - K. GHORESCHI; A. LAURENCE; J. J. O'SHEA, IMMUNOL. REV., (2009), vol. 228, page 273 | - J. J. O'SHEA; M. PESU; D. C. BORIE; P. S. CHANGELIAN, NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2004), vol. 3, page 555 | - Y. MINEGISHI ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2006), vol. 25, page 745 | - O. BDEL-WAHAB, CUR . OPIN. HEMATOL., (2011), vol. 18, page 117 | - K. GHORESCHI ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (2009), vol. 228, page 273 | - A. QUINTAS-CARDAMA; H. KANTARJIAN; J. CORTES; S. VERSTOVSEK, NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2011), vol. 10, page 127 |