blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2759452

EP2759452 - SEATBELT RETRACTOR AND SEATBELT DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, IS
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takata Corporation
12-31 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8508 / JP
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / ASAKO, Tadayuki
c/o TAKATA CORPORATION
12-31, Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8508 / JP
02 / SAKANO, Takashi
c/o TAKATA CORPORATION
12-31, Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8508 / JP
 [2017/46]
Former [2014/31]01 / ASAKO, Tadayuki
c/o TAKATA CORPORATION
12-31 Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8508 / JP
02 / SAKANO, Takashi
c/o TAKATA CORPORATION
12-31 Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8508 / JP
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2017/46]
Former [2014/31]Banzer, Hans-Jörg
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date12834329.007.08.2012
[2017/46]
WO2012JP70087
Priority number, dateJP2011020562021.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011205620
[2014/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013042473
Date:28.03.2013
Language:JA
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2759452
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2759452
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2015
ClassificationIPC:B60R22/48
[2014/31]
CPC:
B60R22/36 (EP,US); B60R22/34 (US); B60R22/46 (EP,US);
B60R2022/4473 (US); B60R2022/4642 (EP,US); B60R2022/4666 (EP,US);
B60R2022/468 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SITZGURTEINZUG UND SITZGURTVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2014/31]
English:SEATBELT RETRACTOR AND SEATBELT DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAME[2014/31]
French:RÉTRACTEUR DE CEINTURE DE SÉCURITÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CEINTURE DE SÉCURITÉ DOTÉ DE CELUI-CI[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2014Translation filed 
03.02.2014National basic fee paid 
03.02.2014Search fee paid 
03.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
27.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2017Fee for grant paid
06.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2016
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.08.2012
AL15.11.2017
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
MK15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
PT15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
IS15.03.2018
GB07.08.2018
IE07.08.2018
LU07.08.2018
MT07.08.2018
[2020/33]
Former [2020/31]HU07.08.2012
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
MK15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
PT15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
GB07.08.2018
IE07.08.2018
LU07.08.2018
MT07.08.2018
Former [2020/28]HU07.08.2012
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
PT15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
GB07.08.2018
IE07.08.2018
LU07.08.2018
MT07.08.2018
Former [2020/16]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
TR15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
GB07.08.2018
IE07.08.2018
LU07.08.2018
MT07.08.2018
Former [2020/08]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
GB07.08.2018
IE07.08.2018
LU07.08.2018
MT07.08.2018
Former [2019/47]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
GB07.08.2018
IE07.08.2018
LU07.08.2018
Former [2019/33]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
IE07.08.2018
LU07.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU07.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP4458526B  (TAKATA CORPORATION) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *
International search[A]JPH08133015  (NIPPON SEIKO KK);
 [A]JP2006290124  (TAKATA CORP)
by applicantJP4458526B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.