blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2759102 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2759102



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 255
26.03.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
15.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
15.10.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.07.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
18.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Description Search / examination 3
18.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.07.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.03.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.03.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
01.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
01.07.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
01.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
01.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
01.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.12.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
23.11.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
20.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.03.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
20.03.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 38
20.03.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 41
20.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
31.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
28.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
28.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 49