blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2759102


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.03.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.07.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.03.2017 First examination report
30.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
04.12.2015 Change - classification published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
04.12.2015 Change - classification published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
04.12.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
01.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
03.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
27.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
25.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
12.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication