blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2759102
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014226486Global Dossier 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP05915 14.09.2012
JP2011206462 21.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6007977BGlobal Dossier 19.10.2016B2
JP2014526813 06.10.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2014513600 14.09.2012
WO2012JP05915 14.09.2012
JP2011206462 21.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2759102Global Dossier 06.01.2016A4
EP2759102 30.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012JP05915 14.09.2012
JP2011206462 21.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013042346Global Dossier 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011206462 21.09.2011