Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2759102

EP2759102 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / AKIYOSHI, Ippei
c/o NEC CORPORATION
7-1 Shiba 5-Chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
02 / MIZUKOSHI, Yasuhiro
c/o NEC CORPORATION
7-1 Shiba 5-Chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
03 / ITOH, Nobuhiko
c/o NEC CORPORATION
7-1 Shiba 5-Chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)MacDougall, Alan John Shaw , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2014/31]
Application number, filing date12834509.714.09.2012
WO2012JP05915
Priority number, dateJP2011020646221.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011206462
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013042346
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2759102
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/70, H04L12/715, H04L12/721
[2016/01]
Former International [2014/31]H04L12/70
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM[2014/31]
English:COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM[2014/31]
French:APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2014National basic fee paid 
20.03.2014Search fee paid 
20.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
01.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002080804  (ANDO TATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,10-12 * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0170] *;
 [A]  - "OpenFlow Switch Specification", (20110228), URL: http://archive.openflow.org/documents/openflow-spec-v1.1.0.pdf, XP055132070 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[X]JP2002190824  (FUJITSU LTD)
by applicantWO2008095010
 US2002080804
    - NICK MCKEOWN, OPENFLOW: ENABLING INNOVATION IN CAMPUS NETWORKS, (20110726), URL: http://www.openflow.org/documents/openflow-wp-latest.pdf
    - OPENFLOW SWITCH SPECIFICATION, (20110726), URL: http://www.openflow.org/documents/openflow-spec-v1 .1.0.pdf