Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2797678 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2797678



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 180
19.09.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.11.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
19.10.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.10.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.10.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
04.10.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
23.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
30.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
30.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2017 Description Search / examination 1
30.03.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
22.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
24.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
10.07.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
27.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
18.07.2013 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 24
13.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
13.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2