Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797678

EP2797678 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / AOKI, Yuki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
 [2017/46]
Former [2014/45]01 / AOKI, Yuki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date12834572.526.12.2012
[2017/46]
WO2012JP08343
Priority number, dateJP2011028879828.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011288798
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099251
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797678
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2797678
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/94, B01J37/02, B01J23/00, B01J23/63, B01J23/83, B01J23/89, B01J35/04
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABGASREINIGUNGSKATALYSATOR[2014/45]
English:EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST[2014/45]
French:CATALYSEUR D'ÉPURATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
24.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2017Fee for grant paid
04.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2016
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.12.2012
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
MK15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE26.12.2017
LU26.12.2017
MT26.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/31]HU26.12.2012
AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE26.12.2017
LU26.12.2017
MT26.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2019/30]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE26.12.2017
LU26.12.2017
MT26.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE26.12.2017
LU26.12.2017
MT26.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE26.12.2017
LU26.12.2017
MT26.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
IE26.12.2017
LU26.12.2017
MT26.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
LU26.12.2017
MT26.12.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
IT15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9500235  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * pages 13-16; example -; claim - * [Y] 1-5;
 [YD]US2011099987  (SATOU AKEMI [JP], et al) [YD] 1-5 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0021] , [0058] , [0063] , [0064] , [0066] , [0069] , [0071]; claim - *;
 [A]EP1704910  (TOKYO ROKI KK [JP], et al) [A] 1;
 [A]EP2036603  (CATALER CORP [JP]) [A] 1
by applicantJP2011183317
 JP4751916B
 JP2010005591