Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2760715

EP2760715 - PARKING PISTON DIRECT CONNECTION TO APR ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.01.2020
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 26.02.2020  [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
[2020/08]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
193 Plantation Drive
Mooresville, NC 28117 / US
02 / DARNER, Brett, S.
122 Grand Avenue
Wellington, OH 44090 / US
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2020/09]
Former [2014/32]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date12835298.616.08.2012
[2020/09]
WO2012US51061
Priority number, dateUS20111324737228.09.2011         Original published format: US201113247372
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013048633
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2760715
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2760715
Date:26.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60T11/10, B60T17/08, F16D65/28, F16D121/10
[2015/44]
Former International [2014/32]B60T11/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIREKTVERBINDUNG EINES PARKKOLBENS MIT EINER APR-STANGE[2014/32]
English:PARKING PISTON DIRECT CONNECTION TO APR ROD[2014/32]
French:LIAISON DIRECTE DE PISTON DE STATIONNEMENT À UNE TIGE DE RELÂCHEMENT DE PRESSION AUTOMATIQUE[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2014National basic fee paid 
28.04.2014Search fee paid 
28.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
14.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2020Fee for grant paid
14.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201403   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[I]US3983790  (JOHANNESEN DONALD D) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [XD]US6164187  (STOJIC STEVEN M [US]) [XD] 1,7 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US7513341  (LACHERMEIER JAKOB [DE]);
 [Y]US2517745  (WEATHERHEAD JR ALBERT J, et al);
 [Y]US7451690  (SCHRADER FRANK [DE], et al);
 [A]US7121191  (FISHER ALBERT D [US])
by applicantUS20100723337