blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2760720 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280057854 EP12835604



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103958302BGlobal Dossier 14.12.2016B
CN103958302 30.07.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US51058 16.08.2012
US201113247449 28.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2760720Global Dossier 10.10.2018B1
EP2760720 15.04.2015A4
EP2760720 06.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US51058 16.08.2012
US201113247449 28.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013048632Global Dossier 04.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113247449 28.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9004236Global Dossier 14.04.2015B2
US2013075211 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113247449 28.09.2011