Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2760720

EP2760720 - PARKING BRAKE PISTON FOR A PARKING BRAKE CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / PLANTAN, Ronald, S.
193 Plantation Drive
Mooresville, NC 28117 / US
02 / DARNER, Brett, S.
122 Grand Avenue
Wellington, OH 44090 / US
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/41]
Former [2014/32]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date12835604.516.08.2012
[2018/41]
WO2012US51058
Priority number, dateUS20111324744928.09.2011         Original published format: US201113247449
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013048632
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2760720
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2760720
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60T17/08
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FESTSTELLBREMSKOLBEN FÜR EINE FESTSTELLBREMSKAMMER[2014/32]
English:PARKING BRAKE PISTON FOR A PARKING BRAKE CHAMBER[2014/32]
French:PISTON DE FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT POUR UNE CHAMBRE DE FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2014National basic fee paid 
28.04.2014Search fee paid 
28.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
12.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2018Fee for grant paid
27.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2018
Opposition(s)11.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201403   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
IT10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/35]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
IT10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
IT10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL10.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0030913  (HOLLAND NEWAY INT INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4231286  (CAMPANINI SERGIO) [Y] 1,2,6-8,12-14 * column 5, lines 56-63 and spring 20 abutting against plate 73 in figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2010154627  (PRAGER CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [Y] 3-11,14,15 * figure 2 and par. [0040] *;
 [A]US5836233  (RUMSEY DONALD [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US3712181  (SWANDER K, et al);
 [X]US5836233  (RUMSEY DONALD [US])