Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2761923

EP2761923 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING PDCP STATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
15.05.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / YI, Seung June
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
02 / CHUN, Sung Duck
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
03 / JUNG, Sung Hoon
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
04 / LEE, Young Dae
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
05 / PARK, Sung Jun
LG R&D Complex
533 Hogye 1-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Gunzelmann, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]Gunzelmann, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12836535.018.09.2012
WO2012KR07463
Priority number, dateUS201161539955P27.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161539955 P
US201161541099P30.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161541099 P
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013048049
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2761923
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BERICHTERSTATTUNG DES PDCP-STATUS[2014/32]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING PDCP STATUS[2014/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE COMMUNIQUER L'ÉTAT D'UN PROTOCOLE PDCP[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2014National basic fee paid 
29.01.2014Search fee paid 
29.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2019Fee for grant paid
15.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011228746  (CHUN SUNG-DUCK [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0034] - [0051] - [0067] - [0076] *;
 [XA]US2009016301  (SAMMOUR MOHAMMED [CA], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0136] - [0139] * [A] 14,15
International search[A]EP1689130  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]EP1915017  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])