Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2760487

EP2760487 - WOUND DRESSINGS AND RELATED METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KPR U.S., LLC
777 West Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2018/07]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PATEL, Harish, A.
24 Bretts Farm Road
Norfolk, MA 02056 / US
02 / MOGHE, Ajit, K.
702 Old Bridge Lane
Bellingham, MA 02019 / US
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/34]
Former [2014/32]Gray, James
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
Application number, filing date12836554.105.09.2012
[2019/34]
WO2012US53741
Priority number, dateUS20111325021030.09.2011         Original published format: US201113250210
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013048681
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2760487
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2760487
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/22, A61F13/15, A61L15/28, A61F13/00
[2015/15]
Former International [2014/32]A61L15/22, A61F13/15, A61L15/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WUNDVERBÄNDE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN[2014/32]
English:WOUND DRESSINGS AND RELATED METHODS THEREFOR[2014/32]
French:PANSEMENTS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2014National basic fee paid 
27.02.2014Search fee paid 
27.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
02.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2019Fee for grant paid
14.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE7835711U  (KARL OTTO BRAUN KG) [X] 1,2,8,11 * page 16, line 1, paragraph 1 - page 17, line 25, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * [Y] 12-14;
 [XYI]US6140257  (KERSHAW DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 8 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 53; examples 2,3,4 * [Y] 12-14 [I] 15,16;
 [XYI]US2010042034  (RIESINGER BIRGIT [DE]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0 40] , [0042] , [0046] , [0049] , [0060] , [0086] - [0089] - [0182] * [Y] 12,14 [I] 1,3-7,9-11;
 [Y]US2003190853  (LOVINGOOD SCOTT A [US]) [Y] 14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0013] *
International search[X]US2003191423  (SUN ROBERT L [US]);
 [Y]US2003190853  (LOVINGOOD SCOTT A [US]);
 [A]US4236550  (BRAUN FRANZ, et al);
 [A]US2003120193  (EVANS JON CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al);
 [A]US2009308404  (LEONARD W ALLEN [US], et al)