blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2760487


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.07.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.01.2018 Change - applicant published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
24.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.10.2017 Change - representative
26.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.07.2017 First examination report
28.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.03.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
06.03.2015 Change - classification published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
06.03.2015 Change - classification published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
05.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
03.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
04.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
27.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
28.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication