blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2760487 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280047470 EP12836554



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103857414Global Dossier 11.06.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US53741 05.09.2012
US201113250210 30.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2760487Global Dossier 15.04.2015A4
EP2760487 06.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US53741 05.09.2012
US201113250210 30.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013048681Global Dossier 04.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113250210 30.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2013085434Global Dossier 04.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113250210 30.09.2011