Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2749272

EP2749272 - SEAMLESS CAPSULE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Morishita Jintan Co., Ltd.
2-40, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-8566 / JP
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / KAMAGUCHI, Ryosei
c/o Morishita Jintan Co. Ltd.
Osaka techno center
11-1 Tsudayamate 2-chome
Hirakata-shi Osaka 57-30128 / JP
02 / NAKANO, Osami
c/o Morishita Jintan Co. Ltd.
Osaka techno center
11-1 Tsudayamate 2-chome
Hirakata-shi Osaka 57-30128 / JP
03 / HATANAKA, Hisaaki
c/o Morishita Jintan Co. Ltd.
Osaka techno center
11-1 Tsudayamate 2-chome
Hirakata-shi Osaka 57-30128 / JP
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date12836631.721.09.2012
WO2012JP74246
Priority number, dateJP2011021454329.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011214543
[2014/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013047376
Date:04.04.2013
Language:JA
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2749272
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/48, A61K47/10, A61K47/42, A61K47/48
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
TitleGerman:NAHTLOSE KAPSEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/27]
English:SEAMLESS CAPSULE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2014/27]
French:CAPSULE MONOBLOC ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014Translation filed 
27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Search fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
15.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5254294  (WUNDERLICH JENS-CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * columns 1,2; figure 1; example 2; claims 1,7,9 * [I] 1-10;
 [I]EP0116311  (MORISHITA JINTAN CO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figures 1-4; claims 1-19 *;
 [I]EP2172225  (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [I] 1-10 * claims 1-35 *;
 [XI]US2005079215  (SCHLEIFENBAUM BIRGIT [CH], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0046] , [ 114]; example 29; claims 1-23 * [I] 1-10;
 [X]US5780056  (AKAMATSU TAKU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1; tables 1-3 *;
 [I]EP1447082  (MORISHITA JINTAN CO [JP]) [I] 7-10 * figure 1; tables 8,9 *;
 [X]WO2008025819  (ALTERGON SA [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 10, paragraph last; example 1 *;
 [X]WO03090726  (BANNER PHARMACAPS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * examples 6, 8-11; claims 8,9; table 6 *
International search[X]JPH07502912  (ALFATEC-PHARMA GMBH);
 [Y]JPS5591358  (TEIJIN LTD, et al);
 [Y]WO0051574  (BANNER PHARMACAPS INC [US]);
 [Y]JP2005529128  (BANNER PHARMACAPS, INC.);
 [A]JP2010501632  (ALTERGON S.A.);
 [A]JP2001089362  (SANSHO IYAKU KK);
 [A]JP2005139152  (AJINOMOTO KK);
 [A]JPH10273436  (TOKAI CAPSULE KK);
 [A]JP2010260812  (NAKANIHON CAPSULE CO LTD);
 [A]JP2004196706  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB, et al)
by applicantJP2006512944
 JPH10512141
 JPS5822062
 JPS59131355