Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2762541

EP2762541 - COATING COMPOSITION AND COATED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kansai Paint Co., Ltd
33-1, Kanzaki-cho
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-8555 / JP
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / IWATA, Naoyuki
c/o KANSAI PAINT CO. LTD.
17-1 Higashiyawata 4-chome
Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP
02 / YAMASHITA, Fumio
c/o KANSAI PAINT CO. LTD.
17-1 Higashiyawata 4-chome
Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2018/16]
Former [2014/32]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date12836824.812.09.2012
[2018/16]
WO2012JP73348
Priority number, dateJP2011021623230.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011216232
[2014/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013047208
Date:04.04.2013
Language:JA
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762541
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2762541
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C09D175/04, C09D7/12, C09D133/14, C09D133/08, C09D133/06, C08K5/00, C08K3/00, C08G18/79, C08G18/78, C08G18/62, C08G18/22
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/32]C09D175/04, C09D7/12, C09D133/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL[2014/32]
English:COATING COMPOSITION AND COATED ARTICLE[2014/32]
French:COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT ET ARTICLE ENDUIT[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2014Translation filed 
13.03.2014National basic fee paid 
13.03.2014Search fee paid 
13.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.03.2018Fee for grant paid
08.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2016
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
IE12.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/33]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
IE12.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
LU12.09.2018
Former [2019/26]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2006247341  (HSIEH BING [US] ET AL) [I] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0018] , [0033] - [0125]; examples 15,17,19,20; claim - * [Y] 2;
 [XY]GB2473102  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 2, line 13 - page 46, line 2; example -; claim - * [Y] 2;
 [XY]GB2456696  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0095] - [0130] - [0170]; example -; claim - * [Y] 2;
 [A]  - "HYDROXYPROPYL ACRYLATE CAS N°: 25584-83-2", (200512), pages 1 - 7, UNEP (United Nations Environment Programme) PUBLICATIONS; OECD SIDS, URL: http://www.inchem.org/documents/sids/sids/25584832.pdf, (20150616), XP002740980 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2011068864  (KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2002097412  (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPH04173882  (TONEN CORP. ET AL.);
 [Y]JPS61231017  (RHEIN-CHEMIE RHEINAU GMBH);
 [Y]JPS60190417  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [Y]JPS5232998  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [A]JPH09299869  (NOF CORP. ET AL.)
by applicantJP2005225907
 JPH10101996
 JP2002097412