blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2760958


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
10.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2015 Change - classification published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
22.05.2015 Change - classification published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
22.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
19.12.2014 Amendment by applicant
05.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
11.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
04.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
07.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.04.2014 Amendment by applicant
19.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication