blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2760958 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280059343 EP12837027



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9676971Global Dossier 13.06.2017B2
US2016222257 04.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201615093399 07.04.2016
US201113250323 30.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103946330Global Dossier 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US58236 01.10.2012
US201113250323 30.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2760958Global Dossier 24.06.2015A4
EP2760958 06.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US58236 01.10.2012
US201113250323 30.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013049786Global Dossier 04.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113250323 30.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9321945Global Dossier 26.04.2016B2
US2013085221 04.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113250323 30.09.2011