Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2760958

EP2760958 - SYSTEMS, METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PRODUCTION OF TIE-LAYER ADHESIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Equistar Chemicals, LP
1221 McKinney Street
One Houston Center
Suite 700
Houston, Texas 77010 / US
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / BOTROS, Maged, G.
8094 Aster Court
Liberty Township, OH 45044 / US
02 / HALEY, Jefrey, C.
2214 Monroe Ave
Norwood, OH 45212 / US
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Sacco, Marco
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Donegani, 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[2014/32]
Application number, filing date12837027.701.10.2012
WO2012US58236
Priority number, dateUS20111325032330.09.2011         Original published format: US201113250323
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013049786
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2760958
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:C09J123/00, C09J123/08, C08J5/18, C08F4/6592, C08F4/70, // C09J151/06, C08F255/02
[2015/26]
Former International [2014/32]C09J123/00, C09J123/08, C08J5/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BINDESCHICHTKLEBSTOFFEN[2014/32]
English:SYSTEMS, METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PRODUCTION OF TIE-LAYER ADHESIVES[2014/32]
French:SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DE FABRICATION D'ADHÉSIFS DE COUCHE DE LIAISON[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2014National basic fee paid 
08.04.2014Search fee paid 
08.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
11.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO2009103516  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 8, line 27 - line 40; examples 4-6; claims 1-20 *;
 [X]GB2081723  (ACC CHEM CO, et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 5; claims 1-12; table 1 *;
 [A]WO2008054637  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2010298500  (LEE CHUN D [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011045295  (VOGT HEINZ [DE], et al);
 [A]US2010174036  (LEE CHUN D [US], et al);
 [A]US2011027583  (LEE CHUN D [US], et al);
 [A]KR20070015410  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE]);
 [A]US2008163978  (BOTROS MAGED G [US])