Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2762232

EP2762232 - PRE-MILLING TREATMENT METHOD FOR PRODUCING RICE FLOUR AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Satake Corporation
7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / FUKUMORI Takeshi
c/o SATAKE CORPORATION
7-2 Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
02 / MIZUNO Hidenori
c/o SATAKE CORPORATION
7-2 Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
03 / MOTOOKA Keiji
c/o SATAKE CORPORATION
7-2 Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
04 / KAJIHARA Kazunobu
c/o SATAKE CORPORATION
7-2 Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
05 / HAKO Tsutomu
c/o SATAKE CORPORATION
7-2 Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
06 / KASHIWA Yoji
c/o SATAKE CORPORATION
7-2 Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
07 / FUKAMI Koji
c/o SATAKE CORPORATION
7-2 Sotokanda 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0021 / JP
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date12837060.808.08.2012
WO2012JP70198
Priority number, dateJP2011021380029.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011213800
[2014/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013046945
Date:04.04.2013
Language:JA
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762232
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:B02B1/04, B02B1/08, A23L1/10
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
TitleGerman:VORZERKLEINERUNGSBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REISMEHL UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2014/32]
English:PRE-MILLING TREATMENT METHOD FOR PRODUCING RICE FLOUR AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2014/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉTRAITEMENT DE BROYAGE POUR PRODUCTION DE FARINE DE RIZ ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase09.04.2014Translation filed 
09.04.2014National basic fee paid 
09.04.2014Search fee paid 
09.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
03.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1661467  (SATAKE ENG CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 3,5 * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 21 - page 4, paragraph 22 * * page 4, paragraph 30 - page 5, paragraph 35 * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 1,2,4;
 [XA]US3228774  (SANDERS JUDSON H, et al) [X] 3 * figure 2 * [A] 1
International search[A]JPS495752  (ARAI FOODS MACHINERY CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2004049036  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB, et al);
 [A]JP2004097081  (KYOTO GRAIN SYSTEM KK);
 [A]JPH0463555  (NIIGATA PREFECTURE);
 [A]JPH04287652  (NIIGATA PREFECTURE)
by applicant   - FUMIO KURASAWA, SAISHIN SHOKUHIN KAKO KOZA, KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENHAKU SHA, pages 221 - 223,