Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2759777

EP2759777 - PURIFIED AIR DISCHARGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koken Ltd.
7 Yonban-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8459 / JP
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI Taketo
c/o KOKEN LTD.
7 Yonban-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8459 / JP
02 / KAKINUMA Tomoyuki
c/o KOKEN LTD.
7 Yonban-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8459 / JP
03 / NITTA Kozo
c/o KOKEN LTD.
7 Yonban-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8459 / JP
04 / FUJISHIRO Yuki
c/o KOKEN LTD.
7 Yonban-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8459 / JP
05 / FUKIURA Kazuma
c/o KOKEN LTD.
7 Yonban-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8459 / JP
06 / SATO Takahiro
c/o KOKEN LTD.
7 Yonban-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8459 / JP
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12837874.222.06.2012
WO2012JP66033
Priority number, dateJP2011021965903.10.2011         Original published format: JP 2011219659
JP2012011685522.05.2012         Original published format: JP 2012116855
[2014/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013051311
Date:11.04.2013
Language:JA
[2013/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2759777
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:F24F7/06, F24F3/16
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/31]F24F7/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:AUSLASSVORRICHTUNG FÜR GEREINIGTE LUFT[2014/31]
English:PURIFIED AIR DISCHARGE DEVICE[2014/31]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉVACUATION D'AIR PURIFIÉ[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2014Translation filed 
25.03.2014National basic fee paid 
25.03.2014Search fee paid 
25.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
07.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US3998142  (FOREMAN ROBERT E, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 68; figures 1-3,8,9 * [I] 5,6;
 [A]JP2010096497  (KOKEN KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004221554  (IIJIMA KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1387989  (ACANTHE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008083337  (YAMANAKA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP2004525337  (ACANTHE);
 [Y]JP2008275266  (KOKEN KK);
 [Y]JPS63176943  (CLEAN AIR SYSTEM KK);
 [A]US6113486  (BEUDON DIDIER [FR], et al);
 [A]JPH0957033  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)
by applicantJP2008275266