Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2759777 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2759777



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 178
17.10.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.10.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
20.08.2019 Claims Search / examination 1
20.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.08.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.05.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.05.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.10.2018 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.04.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
07.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
07.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
07.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 2
05.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
03.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Comments on Written Opinion of ISA Search / examination 3
24.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
24.04.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
25.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Comments on Written Opinion of ISA Search / examination 4
25.03.2014 Description Search / examination 17
25.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
25.03.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.02.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
02.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
11.04.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.04.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
11.04.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 24