Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765454

EP2765454 - DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING A WAVELENGTH CONVERSION LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul, 07336 / KR
[2016/34]
Former [2014/33]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / YOO, Younggil
Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc.
16 Umyeon-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-724 / KR
02 / SUNG, Myeonchang
Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc.
16 Umyeon-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-724 / KR
03 / KIM, Joongnyon
Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc.
16 Umyeon-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-724 / KR
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2016/50]
Former [2014/33]Urner, Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date12838604.213.03.2012
[2016/50]
WO2012KR01804
Priority number, dateKR2011010056704.10.2011         Original published format: KR 20110100567
[2014/33]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013051771
Date:11.04.2013
Language:KO
[2013/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2765454
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2765454
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03B21/20, F21V9/08, H04N9/31
[2015/49]
Former International [2014/33]G03B21/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER WELLENLÄNGENKONVERSIONSSCHICHT[2014/33]
English:DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING A WAVELENGTH CONVERSION LAYER[2014/33]
French:APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE CONVERSION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE[2014/33]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2013Translation filed 
06.08.2013National basic fee paid 
06.08.2013Search fee paid 
06.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/33]
21.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2016Fee for grant paid
04.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2016
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.03.2012
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE13.03.2017
LU13.03.2017
MT13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE13.03.2017
LU13.03.2017
MT13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE13.03.2017
LU13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/10]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
LU13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010171440  (SATOU YOSHIHITO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] , [0199]; figure 2B *
International search[Y]JP2008159936  (KYOCERA CORP);
 [Y]KR20110032339  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [Y]JP2008010298  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD);
 [A]JP2005285800  (KYOCERA CORP)