EP2763701 - MODIFIED NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES, AND NUCLEIC ACIDS, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ModernaTX, Inc. 200 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Moderna Therapeutics, Inc. 320 Bent Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02141 / US | ||
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Moderna Therapeutics, Inc. 320 Bent Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02141 / US | ||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Moderna Therapeutics, Inc. 200 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE FOUGEROLLES, Antonin 66 Summit Avenue Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 02 /
ROY, Atanu 115 Hill Street, nr. 9 Stoneham, MA 02180 / US | 03 /
SCHRUM, Jason P. 20 Watertown St. Unit 129 Watertown MA 02472-2580 / US | 04 /
SIDDIQI, Suhaib 37 University Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 05 /
HATALA, Paul 26 Monument Street, nr. 1 Charlestown, MA 02124 / US | 06 /
BANCEL, Stephane c/o Moderna Therapeutics, Inc. 320 Bent Street Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | [2015/48] |
Former [2015/34] | 01 /
DE FOUGEROLLES, Antonin 66 Summit Avenue Brookline, MA 02446 / US | ||
02 /
ROY, Atanu 115 Hill Street, nr. 9 Stoneham, MA 02180 / US | |||
03 /
SCHRUM, Jason P. 20 Watertown St. Unit 129 Watertown MA 02472-2580 / US | |||
04 /
SIDDIQI, Suhaib 37 University Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | |||
05 /
HATALA, Paul 26 Monument Street, nr. 1 Charlestown, MA 02124 / US | |||
06 /
BANCEL, Stephane 320 Bent Street Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | |||
Former [2014/33] | 01 /
DE FOUGEROLLES, Antonin 66 Summit Avenue Brookline, MA 02446 / US | ||
02 /
ROY, Atanu 115 Hill Street, nr. 9 Stoneham, MA 02180 / US | |||
03 /
SCHRUM, Jason P. 20 Watertown St. Unit 129 Watertown MA 02472-2580 / US | |||
04 /
SIDDIQI, Suhaib 37 University Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | |||
05 /
HATALA, Paul 26 Monument Street, nr. 1 Charlestown, MA 02124 / US | |||
06 /
BANCEL, Stephane 200 Technology Square Boston, MA 02139 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/51] |
Former [2014/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12838676.0 | 03.10.2012 | [2018/51] | WO2012US58519 | Priority number, date | US201161542533P | 03.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161542533 P | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013052523 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2763701 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2763701 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C07H21/02, C07H21/04 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
A61K48/0066 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07K14/535 (IL,KR,US);
A61K38/193 (EP,IL,US);
A61K48/0033 (KR);
A61K48/0075 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61K9/0021 (KR);
A61K9/5123 (KR);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H21/02 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N15/11 (IL,RU,US);
C12N15/67 (EP,IL,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | 02.05.2014 | ME | 02.05.2014 | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE NUKLEOSIDE, NUKLEOTIDE UND NUKLEINSÄUREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2014/33] | English: | MODIFIED NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES, AND NUCLEIC ACIDS, AND USES THEREOF | [2014/33] | French: | NUCLÉOSIDES, NUCLÉOTIDES ET ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES MODIFIÉS, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 13.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18213451.0 / EP3492109 | EP19216461.4 / EP3682905 | EP21210754.4 / EP4015005 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2012 | AL | 19.12.2018 | AT | 19.12.2018 | CY | 19.12.2018 | CZ | 19.12.2018 | DK | 19.12.2018 | EE | 19.12.2018 | ES | 19.12.2018 | FI | 19.12.2018 | HR | 19.12.2018 | IT | 19.12.2018 | LT | 19.12.2018 | LV | 19.12.2018 | MC | 19.12.2018 | MK | 19.12.2018 | MT | 19.12.2018 | NL | 19.12.2018 | PL | 19.12.2018 | RO | 19.12.2018 | RS | 19.12.2018 | SE | 19.12.2018 | SI | 19.12.2018 | SK | 19.12.2018 | SM | 19.12.2018 | TR | 19.12.2018 | BG | 19.03.2019 | NO | 19.03.2019 | GR | 20.03.2019 | IS | 19.04.2019 | PT | 19.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.10.2012 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
MT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.10.2012 | |
AL | 19.12.2018 | ||
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CY | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
MC | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
TR | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SI | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
DK | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
AT | 19.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SK | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IS | 19.04.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
EE | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RO | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
SM | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
CZ | 19.12.2018 | ||
ES | 19.12.2018 | ||
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
PL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
IT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
PT | 19.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
NL | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.12.2018 | |
FI | 19.12.2018 | ||
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
RS | 19.12.2018 | ||
SE | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
GR | 20.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
HR | 19.12.2018 | ||
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
LV | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
BG | 19.03.2019 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.12.2018 | |
LT | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 19.12.2018 | |
NO | 19.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011012316 (UNIV MUENCHEN L MAXIMILIANS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 12 *; | [A] - KARIKÓ KATALIN ET AL, "Incorporation of pseudouridine into mRNA yields superior nonimmunogenic vector with increased translational capacity and biological stability", MOLECULAR THERAPY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 16, no. 11, doi:10.1038/MT.2008.200, ISSN 1525-0024, (20081101), pages 1833 - 1840, (20080916), XP002598556 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2008.200 | [A] - LUIGI WARREN ET AL, "Highly efficient reprogramming to pluripotency and directed differentiation of human cells with synthetic modified mRNA", CELL STEM CELL, CELL PRESS, UNITED STATES, vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.STEM.2010.08.012, ISSN 1875-9777, (20101105), pages 618 - 630, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S1934590910004340, XP002693059 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.STEM.2010.08.012 | International search | [A]US2010047261 (HOERR INGMAR [DE], et al); | [X]US2011143397 (KARIKO KATALIN [US], et al); | [T]US2012251618 (SCHRUM JASON P [US], et al) | by applicant | US4270537 | US4596556 | US4790824 | US4886499 | US4940460 | US4941880 | US5015235 | US5064413 | US5141496 | US5190521 | US5208020 | US5312335 | US5328483 | US5334144 | US5339163 | US5383851 | US5417662 | US5466220 | US5475092 | US5480381 | US5503627 | US5520639 | US5527288 | US5569189 | US5585499 | US5599302 | WO9713537 | US5649912 | WO9737705 | US5704911 | US5846545 | US5893397 | WO9934850 | US5993412 | US2011143397 | US2011177495 | - KARIKO et al., Mol Ther., (20080000), vol. 16, no. 11, pages 1833 - 1840 | - ALBRECHT, Immunotherapy, (20100000), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 795 - 8 | - CARON et al., Mol Ther., (20010000), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 310 - 8 | - EL-ANDALOUSSI et al., Curr Pharm Des., (20050000), vol. 11, no. 28, pages 3597 - 611 | - DESHAYES et al., Cell Mol Life Sci., (20050000), vol. 62, no. 16, pages 1839 - 49 | - CARILLO et al., SIAM J. Applied Math., (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073 | - MUSUNURU K et al., "From noncoding variant to phenotype via SORTI at the lp 13 cholesterol locus", Nature, (20100000), vol. 466, pages 714 - 721 | - MEYERS; MILLER, CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - ESVELT et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 472, no. 7344, pages 499 - 503 | - CHELLISERRYKATTIL; ELLINGTON, Nature Biotechnology, (20040000), vol. 22, no. 9, pages 1155 - 1160 | - PADILLA; SOUSA, Nucleic Acids Research, (20020000), vol. 30, no. 24, page e128 | - ROBBINS et al., Oligonucleotides, (20090000), vol. 19, pages 89 - 102 | - KARIKO et al., Immunity, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 165 - 175 | - WARREN et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20100000), vol. 7, pages 618 - 630 |