EP2767928 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY IDENTIFYING A QR CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yewon Communication Co., Ltd. 30 Yonsei-ro Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-834 / KR | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAE, So Woon 101-302 Palice Town 637 Dongyang-dong Gyeyang-gu Incheon 407-340 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Byoung Sun 1101-604 Jugong Apt. Pyeongnae-dong Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 472-140 / KR | 03 /
YANG, Sung Ho c/o Yewon Communication Co., Ltd. 30 Yonsei-ro, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-834 / KR | [2015/05] |
Former [2014/40] | 01 /
BAE, So Woon 101-302 Palice Town 637 Dongyang-dong Gyeyang-gu Incheon 407-340 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Byoung Sun 1101-604 Jugong Apt. Pyeongnae-dong Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 472-140 / KR | |||
03 /
YANG, Sung Ho no.303, Yeoksam-Ro 11 Gil 1-2 Gangnam-gu, Seoul 135-080 / KR | |||
Former [2014/34] | 01 /
BAE, So Woon 101-302 Palice Town 637 Dongyang-dong Gyeyang-gu Incheon 407-340 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Byoung Sun 1101-604 Jugong Apt. Pyeongnae-dong Namyangju-si Gyeonggi-do 472-140 / KR | |||
03 /
YANG, Sung Ho 303 Acvill 752-40 Yeoksam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-080 / KR | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2014/34] | Application number, filing date | 12839367.5 | 09.10.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012KR08142 | Priority number, date | KR20110102832 | 10.10.2011 Original published format: KR 20110102832 | [2014/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013055069 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767928 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2767928 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K7/14 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G06K7/10811 (EP,US);
G06F18/2113 (US);
G06K7/1417 (EP,US);
G06K7/1443 (EP,US);
G06K7/1465 (EP,US);
G06K7/1478 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/27] | G06K9/18, H04B1/38, G06K7/14 | ||
Former IPC [2014/34] | G06K9/18, H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES QR-CODES | [2014/34] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY IDENTIFYING A QR CODE | [2014/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN CODE QR | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | Translation filed | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 09.10.2016 | LU | 09.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 09.10.2012 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.10.2012 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.10.2012 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005121520 (YAMAGUCHI NOBUYASU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0131] * * figures 11-27 *; | [Y]KR100860994B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,10 * abstract *; | US2009034953 [ ] (HWANG YOUNG-KYOO [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0071] *; | [Y]KR100920663B (ITOPF CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20010113578 (COLORZIP MEDIA INC [KR]); | [Y]KR100852656B (FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.); | [Y]KR100860994B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR100920663B (ITOPF CORP [KR]) | by applicant | KR20100085887 |