Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2753114

EP2753114 - UPLINK TRANSMIT POWER DETERMINATION METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2016/22]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Yuanjie
Huawei Technologie Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantin
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 578129 / CN
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2016/22]
Former [2014/28]Lord, Michael
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date12839400.426.09.2012
[2016/22]
WO2012CN81974
Priority number, dateCN20111030278709.10.2011         Original published format: CN201110302787
[2014/28]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013053288
Date:18.04.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2753114
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2753114
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04W24/08, H04W52/14, H04W52/32, H04W52/34
[2016/02]
Former International [2014/31]H04W24/10, H04W52/14, H04W52/32, H04W52/34
Former International [2014/28]H04W24/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER UPLINK-SENDELEISTUNG[2014/28]
English:UPLINK TRANSMIT POWER DETERMINATION METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT[2014/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014Translation filed 
31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Search fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
16.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2016Fee for grant paid
21.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16161065.4  / EP3096551
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2015
Opposition(s)02.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.09.2012
AL01.06.2016
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IE26.09.2016
LU26.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU26.09.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
BG01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IE26.09.2016
LU26.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU26.09.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IE26.09.2016
LU26.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU26.09.2012
AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CY01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
MK01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IE26.09.2016
LU26.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/41]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IE26.09.2016
LU26.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IE26.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/31]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
DK01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
MC01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SI01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT01.06.2016
BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
SM01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
PT03.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE01.06.2016
CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
PL01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
SK01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
IS01.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ01.06.2016
EE01.06.2016
FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
IT01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RO01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
SE01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
GR02.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI01.06.2016
HR01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
LV01.06.2016
RS01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI01.06.2016
LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT01.06.2016
NO01.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011120716  (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 26, lines 13-23 * * page 27, line 31 - page 28, line 10 * * page 30, lines 14-19 * * page 49, lines 6-12, 23-26 * * page 50, lines 11-12 *;
 [X]  ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "Multiple Timing Advances for Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113314 MULTIPLE TA FOR CA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111004), vol. RAN WG1, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050538402 [X] 1-14 * Chapter 1 * * Chapter 3 * * Chapter 4 *
 [A]  "DRAFT3GPP TS 36.213 Va.0.0 (2010-12)", 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT36213-A00, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101221), vol. RAN WG1, XP050473758 [A] 1-14 * Chapter 5.1.1.1 * * Chapter 6.1 *
International search[X]CN102123437  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH);
 [A]CN102104905  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH);
 [A]EP2362699  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al)