Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2766926

EP2766926 - PLANARIZED SEMICONDUCTOR PARTICLES POSITIONED ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diftek Lasers, Inc.
465 Kingsford Place
Waterloo, ON N2T 1K9 / CA
[2014/34]
Inventor(s)01 / DYKAAR, Douglas, R.
165 Kingsford Place
Waterloo, Ontario N2T 1K9 / CA
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)Clarke, Geoffrey Howard
Lane IP Limited The Forum St Paul's
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Pedder, James Cuthbert
Lane IP
55 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1RX / GB
Application number, filing date12839944.112.10.2012
WO2012CA00956
Priority number, dateUS201161547110P14.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161547110 P
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013053052
Date:18.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2766926
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013
[2014/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA18.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/77, H01L29/06, H01L21/336, H01L29/78, B81C1/00
[2015/42]
Former International [2015/24]H01L21/77, H01L29/06, H01L21/336, H01L29/78
Former International [2014/34]H01L21/77, H01L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
TitleGerman:AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT POSITIONIERTE PLANARISIERTE HALBLEITERPARTIKEL[2014/34]
English:PLANARIZED SEMICONDUCTOR PARTICLES POSITIONED ON A SUBSTRATE[2014/34]
French:PARTICULES SEMI-CONDUCTRICES PLANARISÉES DISPOSÉES SUR UN SUBSTRAT[2014/34]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2014National basic fee paid 
10.01.2014Search fee paid 
10.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA
10.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
29.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008121987  (CHEN YIJIAN [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2010216076  (HONG BYUNG YOU [KR] ET AL) [A] 12 * paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002050061  (KOMYOJI DAIDO [JP] ET AL) [A] 12,13 * paragraphs [0263] , [0298]; figure 38 *;
 [A]KR20080104947  (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 12 * figures 1-5 *
 [I]  - TALGHADER J J, "INTEGRATION OF LEDS AND VCSELS USING FLUIDIC SELF-ASSEMBLY", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, (19980128), vol. 3286, doi:10.1117/12.305449, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-62841-388-5, pages 86 - 95, XP000909119 [I] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.305449
International search[A]JP2011181534  (HIROTO ET AL.);
 [A]US2010052511  (KEESMANN);
 [A]DE112006000411T  (KASAHRA ET AL.);
 [X]US7205626  (NAKATA)
 [A]  - GHARGHI ET AL., "Three-Dimensional Modeling and Simulation of p-n Junction Spherical Silicon Solar Cells", IEEE TRANS. ELECTRON DEVICES, (200606), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 1355 - 1363, XP055140534

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TED.2006.873843