blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2767567


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.06.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.02.2019 First examination report
19.02.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2017 Change - representative
04.05.2017 Change - representative
17.02.2017 Change - applicant published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
31.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
18.02.2015 Supplementary search report published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
13.02.2015 Change - classification published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
13.02.2015 Change - classification published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
12.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]
29.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
18.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
07.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication