Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2767567

EP2767567 - ADHESIVE TAPE FOR CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Chem, Ltd.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2017/12]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
LG Hausys, Ltd.
One IFC
10 Gukjegeumyung-ro
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JANG, Ae Jung
303, 419-1 Yongsin-ro
Sangnok-gu, Ansan-si
Gyeonggi-do 426-818 / KR
02 / KIM, Jang Soon
903-901 BaekhyeonMaeul 9 Danji Apt.
Baekhyeon-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-420 / KR
03 / YOO, Seung Min
103-502 Ssangyong Sweet Dot Home
Geumjeong-dong
Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 435-050 / KR
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12840746.711.10.2012
WO2012KR08260
Priority number, dateKR2011010350211.10.2011         Original published format: KR 20110103502
[2014/34]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013055122
Date:18.04.2013
Language:KO
[2013/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2767567
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:C09J121/00, C08J5/18, B32B37/12, C09J7/02, C09J125/10, C09J133/00, C09J153/02
[2015/12]
Former International [2014/34]C09J121/00, C08J5/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
TitleGerman:KLEBEBAND FÜR FAHRZEUGE[2014/34]
English:ADHESIVE TAPE FOR CAR[2014/34]
French:BANDE ADHÉSIVE POUR VOITURE[2014/34]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2014Translation filed 
21.03.2014National basic fee paid 
21.03.2014Search fee paid 
21.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
15.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2226369  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0110] *;
 [X]WO2008070386  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0090] *
International search[X]WO2010101738  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al);
 [A]KR20090094441  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]);
 [A]US6231962  (BRIES JAMES L [US], et al);
 [A]US2011217542  (MOROISHI YUTAKA [JP], et al)
by applicantKR20070041896
 KR20070004837