Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2768380

EP2768380 - GONIO LENS SYSTEM WITH STABILIZATION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVARTIS AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2016/49]
Former [2014/35]For all designated states
Transcend Medical, Inc.
127 Independence Dr.
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHN, Steven
127 Independence Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / LILLY, Richard, S.
127 Independence Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / CLAUSON, Luke
127 Independence Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / VOLD, Steven
127 Independence Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
05 / WALSH, Brian
127 Independence Drive
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/32]
Former [2014/35]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Application number, filing date12841249.119.10.2012
[2018/32]
WO2012US61141
Priority number, dateUS201161550337P21.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161550337 P
US201261635686P19.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261635686 P
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013059678
Date:25.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2768380
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013
[2014/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2768380
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/117, A61B3/10, G02C7/02, A61F9/007
[2014/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GONIOLINSENSYSTEM MIT STABILISIERUNGSMECHANISMUS[2014/35]
English:GONIO LENS SYSTEM WITH STABILIZATION MECHANISM[2014/35]
French:SYSTÈME DE GONIOSCOPE POURVU D'UN MÉCANISME DE STABILISATION[2014/35]
Entry into regional phase20.05.2014National basic fee paid 
20.05.2014Search fee paid 
20.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/35]
03.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2018Fee for grant paid
29.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2017
Opposition(s)09.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
LU19.10.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/28]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
MC08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
DK08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
SM08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/24]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
EE08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
SK08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
CZ08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RO08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL08.08.2018
AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
LV08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
HR08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT08.08.2018
FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
PL08.08.2018
RS08.08.2018
SE08.08.2018
BG08.11.2018
NO08.11.2018
GR09.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NL08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI08.08.2018
LT08.08.2018
NO08.11.2018
IS08.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT08.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2430851  (LEE ALLEN EDWIN) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2010118270  (SHEA WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0008] - [0018]; figure A; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US2004036839  (FISCHER KONRAD [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0065] *
International search[Y]US2010274258  (SILVESTRINI THOMAS A [US], et al);
 [Y]US5537164  (SMITH ALAN D [US]);
 [A]US5290293  (VAN NOY STEPHEN J [US], et al);
 [A]US2011213342  (TRIPATHI ASHOK BURTON [US], et al)
by applicantUS2430851