blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2770627 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2770627



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 256
28.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
25.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.06.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.03.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
01.09.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
01.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
01.09.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
01.09.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
01.09.2016 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.02.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.02.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
25.01.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
26.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
07.05.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
15.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
15.04.2014 Description Search / examination 51
15.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 16
15.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.02.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
25.04.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 57