blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2770627


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.06.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2018 First examination report
27.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2016 Amendment by applicant
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
05.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.08.2014  [2014/35]
25.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  27.08.2014  [2014/35]
03.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
07.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication