blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2770627 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280050047 EP12841942



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9312799Global Dossier 12.04.2016B2
US2014346983 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011231882 21.10.2011
WO2012JP75608 03.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103875175BGlobal Dossier 13.07.2016B
CN103875175 18.06.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2011231882 21.10.2011
WO2012JP75608 03.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2770627Global Dossier 09.03.2016A4
EP2770627 27.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011231882 21.10.2011
WO2012JP75608 03.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013058109Global Dossier 25.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011231882 21.10.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5916342BGlobal Dossier 11.05.2016B2
JP2013090545 13.05.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2011231882 21.10.2011