Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2770627

EP2770627 - MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE AND MOTOR CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
[2014/35]
Inventor(s)01 / KATO Yoshiki
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date12841942.103.10.2012
WO2012JP75608
Priority number, dateJP2011023188221.10.2011         Original published format: JP 2011231882
[2014/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013058109
Date:25.04.2013
Language:JA
[2013/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2770627
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02P21/00
[2016/10]
Former International [2014/35]H02P6/16, H02P21/00, H02P27/04, H02P29/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
TitleGerman:MOTORSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND MOTORSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN[2014/35]
English:MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE AND MOTOR CONTROL METHOD[2014/35]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR[2014/35]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2014Translation filed 
15.04.2014National basic fee paid 
15.04.2014Search fee paid 
15.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/35]
01.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2001008486  (HITACHI LTD; HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - SEON-HWAN HWANG ET AL, "Compensation of Amplitude Imbalance and Imperfect Quadrature in Resolver Signals for PMSM Drives", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS., US, (20110101), vol. 47, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TIA.2010.2091477, ISSN 0093-9994, pages 134 - 143, XP055246087 [I] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIA.2010.2091477
International search[X]JP2001008486  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [A]JP2010178404  (FUJITEC CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP3789895B
 JP2002374692
    - SHINJI SHINNAKA, Vector Control Technology of Permanent Magnet Synchronous Motor, DEMPA PUBLICATIONS, INC., (2008), page 98
    - MORIMOTO; TAKEDA, "Generalized Analysis of Operating Limits of PM Motor and Suitable Machine Parameters for Constant Power Operation", IEEJ TRANSACTIONS D, (1997), vol. 117, no. 6, pages 751 - 757