Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2770073

EP2770073 - ROLL SURFACE-LAYER MATERIAL FOR HOT ROLLING WITH EXCELLENT FATIGUE RESISTANCE PRODUCED BY CENTRIFUGAL CASTING, AND COMPOSITE ROLL FOR HOT ROLLING PRODUCED THROUGH CENTRIFUGAL CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
[2014/35]
Inventor(s)01 / ICHINO, Kenji
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
02 / MOCHIDA, Tetsuo
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
03 / SHIBATA, Hiromitsu
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
 [2016/19]
Former [2014/35]01 / ICHINO, Kenji
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
02 / MOCHIDA, Tetsuo
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
03 / SHIBATA, Hiromitsu
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.
JFE Steel Corporation
2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0011 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/19]
Former [2014/35]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12842076.715.10.2012
[2016/19]
WO2012JP06581
Priority number, dateJP2011022939819.10.2011         Original published format: JP 2011229398
JP2012003350620.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012033506
[2014/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013057914
Date:25.04.2013
Language:JA
[2013/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2770073
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2770073
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:C22C37/00, C22C37/06, C22C37/10, B21B27/00, B21B27/03, B32B15/01, C21D9/38, B22D13/02, C21D1/25
[2015/52]
Former International [2015/18]C22C37/00, B21B27/00, B22D13/02, C22C37/06, C22C37/10, B32B15/01, C21D9/38, C21D1/25, B21B27/03
Former International [2014/35]C22C37/00, B21B27/00, B22D13/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WALZENFLÄCHENSCHICHTMATERIAL ZUM WARMWALZEN MIT AUSGEZEICHNETER ERMÜDUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT DURCH SCHLEUDERGIESSEN UND DURCH SCHLEUDERGIESSEN HERGESTELLTE VERBUNDWALZE ZUM WARMWALZEN[2014/35]
English:ROLL SURFACE-LAYER MATERIAL FOR HOT ROLLING WITH EXCELLENT FATIGUE RESISTANCE PRODUCED BY CENTRIFUGAL CASTING, AND COMPOSITE ROLL FOR HOT ROLLING PRODUCED THROUGH CENTRIFUGAL CASTING[2014/35]
French:MATÉRIAU DE COUCHE SUPERFICIELLE DE ROULEAU DESTINÉ À EFFECTUER UN LAMINAGE À CHAUD ET QUI PRÉSENTE UNE EXCELLENTE RÉSISTANCE À LA FATIGUE ET EST PRODUIT PAR UNE COULÉE PAR CENTRIFUGATION, ET ROULEAU COMPOSITE POUR UN LAMINAGE À CHAUD PRODUIT AU MOYEN D'UNE COULÉE PAR CENTRIFUGATION[2014/35]
Entry into regional phase07.04.2014Translation filed 
07.04.2014National basic fee paid 
07.04.2014Search fee paid 
07.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/35]
23.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2016Fee for grant paid
22.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2015
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.10.2012
AL11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
IE15.10.2016
LU15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU15.10.2012
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
TR11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
IE15.10.2016
LU15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/38]HU15.10.2012
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
IE15.10.2016
LU15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU15.10.2012
BE11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
IE15.10.2016
LU15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/30]HU15.10.2012
BE11.05.2016
CY11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IS11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
MK11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
IE15.10.2016
LU15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/51]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
IE15.10.2016
LU15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/40]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
LU15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/37]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
GB15.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/04]FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2010275595  (JFE STEEL CORP) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0559899  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * tables 3-4 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]JP2006075892  (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0464780  (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * table 9 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0698670  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * example 1; tables 1-2 * * claims 1-18 *;
 [A]EP0430241  (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-8 * * tables 1-6 *;
 [A]JPH08325673  (YODOGAWA STEEL WORKS) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH05132735  (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2004255457  (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2010275595  (JFE STEEL CORP);
 [A]JP2005232519  (JFE STEEL KK);
 [A]JP2001150007  (KUBOTA KK);
 [A]JPH11229069  (KUBOTA KK);
 [A]JP2002331344  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO)
by applicantJPH04365836
 JPH051350
 JP2009221573
 JP2010101752