Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2772368

EP2772368 - HEAVY LOAD PNEUMATIC RADIAL TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/15]
Former [2014/36]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUMURA, Hiroyuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date12843345.525.10.2012
[2017/15]
WO2012JP06870
Priority number, dateJP2011023430825.10.2011         Original published format: JP 2011234308
[2014/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013061602
Date:02.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2772368
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2772368
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/20, B60C11/00, B60C9/18
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/36]B60C9/20, B60C11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHWERLAST-RADIALLUFTREIFEN[2014/36]
English:HEAVY LOAD PNEUMATIC RADIAL TIRE[2014/36]
French:PNEU RADIAL POUR LOURDES CHARGES[2014/36]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2014Translation filed 
15.04.2014National basic fee paid 
15.04.2014Search fee paid 
15.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
20.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2017Fee for grant paid
06.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2016
Opposition(s)15.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
GB25.10.2017
IE25.10.2017
LU25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
GB25.10.2017
LU25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
GB25.10.2017
LU25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/35]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
GB25.10.2017
LU25.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/29]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL12.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1787825  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0040]; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2010095439  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0033] - [0039]; figure 4 *
International search[Y]JPH07132707  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2008544912  (SOCIETE DE TECHNOLOGIE MICHELIN);
 [Y]JP2007196866  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND);
 [Y]JP2009052158  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [Y]WO03086782  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPS61135803  (BRIDGESTONE CORP)