blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2772368 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2772368



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
16.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
06.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
06.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
26.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
14.09.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.01.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
20.01.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.07.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 1
14.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
30.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.06.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
02.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
13.05.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
15.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Description Search / examination 10
15.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
15.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
02.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.05.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
02.05.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 16