blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2772368


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
10.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
08.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.09.2016 Change - classification published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
16.09.2016 Change - classification published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
26.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
15.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
26.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
17.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
01.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
17.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication