blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2772368 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280052806 EP12843345



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9849725Global Dossier 26.12.2017B2
US2014311647 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
WO2012JP06870 25.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103906631BGlobal Dossier 25.05.2016B
CN103906631 02.07.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
WO2012JP06870 25.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2852623Global Dossier 22.12.2015C
CA2852623 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
WO2012JP06870 25.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2772368Global Dossier 12.04.2017B1
EP2772368 12.08.2015A4
EP2772368 03.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
WO2012JP06870 25.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012329419B 27.08.2015B2
AU2012329419 01.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
WO2012JP06870 25.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2629695T 14.08.2017T3
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
WO2012JP06870 25.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2576361 27.02.2016C2
RU2014121086 10.12.2015A
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
WO2012JP06870 25.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013061602Global Dossier 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5836055BGlobal Dossier 24.12.2015B2
JP2013091402 16.05.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2011234308 25.10.2011