Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2757849

EP2757849 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MULTICARRIER SCHEDULING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2016/11]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / QUAN, Wei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / CHEN, Yuhua
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2016/11]
Former [2014/30]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date12843385.116.10.2012
[2016/11]
WO2012CN83014
Priority number, dateCN20111033187927.10.2011         Original published format: CN201110331879
[2014/30]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013060246
Date:02.05.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2757849
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2757849
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN02.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12, H04L5/00
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/31]H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04L5/00
Former International [2014/30]H04W72/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR MEHRTRÄGERPLANUNG[2014/30]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MULTICARRIER SCHEDULING[2014/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PLANIFICATION MULTI-PORTEUSES[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2014Translation filed 
17.04.2014National basic fee paid 
17.04.2014Search fee paid 
17.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
27.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.12.2015Fee for grant paid
25.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.09.2015
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.10.2012
AL16.03.2016
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE16.10.2016
LU16.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU16.10.2012
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE16.10.2016
LU16.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2018/31]HU16.10.2012
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE16.10.2016
LU16.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU16.10.2012
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
MK16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE16.10.2016
LU16.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
IE16.10.2016
LU16.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/42]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
LU16.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/19]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
SM16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
PL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
IS16.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
LV16.03.2016
RS16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
LT16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI16.03.2016
HR16.03.2016
NO16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2009154530  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 7, line 30 - page 12, line 30; figures 6-9 *;
 [A]WO2010048178  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 10, paragraph 46 - page 14, paragraph 61 *;
 [A]WO2009120123  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 12, paragraph 42 - page 14, paragraph 48 *
International search[A]CN101909356  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO);
 [A]CN102186251  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]WO2011084020  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al);
 [A]WO2011085230  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al);
 [A]WO2011090688  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al)