Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791614

EP2791614 - ANTI-BALLISTIC SHELTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shieldpro, LLC
706 E. Walnut Avenue
Orange, CA 92867 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Peters Security International, Inc.
706 East Walnut Avenue
Orange, CA 92867 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PETERS, Fred E.
706 East Walnut Avenue
Orange, CA 92867 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]01 / PETERS, Fred, E.
706 East Walnut Avenue
Orange, CA 92867 / US
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date12843505.424.10.2012
WO2012US61670
Priority number, dateUS201161550596P24.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161550596 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013063099
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791614
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:F41H1/02, F41H5/24, F41H5/013, F41H5/08, E04H15/34, // F41H5/04
[2015/42]
Former International [2014/43]F41H1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:ANTIBALLISTISCHE SCHUTZRÄUME[2014/43]
English:ANTI-BALLISTIC SHELTERS[2014/43]
French:ABRIS ANTI-BALISTIQUES[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2014National basic fee paid 
08.09.2014Search fee paid 
08.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/43]
08.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
04.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/09]
08.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2018
Request for further processing for:08.09.2014Request for further processing filed
08.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
PL, IE, CY, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
08.09.2014Request for further processing filed
08.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
08.09.2014Request for further processing filed
08.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2014Decision despatched
08.09.2014Request for further processing filed
08.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
08.09.2014Request for further processing filed
08.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
08.09.2014Request for further processing filed
08.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2007039639  (DUNCAN DAVID [US]) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 11] - [0015]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2-7,9-14;
 [Y]US6846758  (BHATNAGAR ASHOK [US] ET AL) [Y] 2-7,9-14 * column 2, lines 42-48 *;
 [Y]US5554816  (SKAGGS SAMUEL R [US] ET AL) [Y] 5,12 * column 9, lines 38-62; figures 7-9 *;
 [X]US5703316  (MADDEN JR JAMES R [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 21; figures 7-11 *
International search[X]US2007039639  (DUNCAN);
 [Y]US6846758  (BHATNAGAR ET AL);
 [Y]US3712363  (THOMASSEN ET AL);
 [Y]US5554816  (SKAGGS ET AL)
by applicantUS2007039639