EP2771033 - PROTEIN FORMULATIONS CONTAINING AMINO ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integritybio Inc. 820 Calle Plano Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Byeong, Seon 14735 Sutton Street Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 / US | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Schlich, George Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12843696.1 | 26.10.2012 | WO2012US62282 | Priority number, date | US201161552688P | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161552688 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013063510 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771033 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/16, A61K47/12, A61K9/08, A61K39/395, A61K38/47, A61K38/48, A61K38/57, A61K47/18, C07K16/10, C07K16/22, C07K16/24, C07K16/28, C07K16/32 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
A61K47/183 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/47 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/4846 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/57 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39591 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/22 (US);
C07K16/1027 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/241 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2866 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y302/01022 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y302/01045 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y304/21022 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/94 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | A61K47/16, A61K47/12, A61K9/08, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Title | German: | PROTEINFORMULIERUNGEN MIT AMINOSÄUREN | [2014/36] | English: | PROTEIN FORMULATIONS CONTAINING AMINO ACIDS | [2014/36] | French: | FORMULATIONS PROTÉIQUES CONTENANT DES ACIDES AMINÉS | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 15.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP19166363.2 / EP3578203 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2012138958 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * figures 2-3 *; | [Y] - ROBERT J FALCONER ET AL, "Stabilization of a monoclonal antibody during purification and formulation by addition of basic amino acid excipients", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY & BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20110707), vol. 86, no. 7, doi:10.1002/jctb.2657, ISSN 0268-2575, pages 942 - 948, XP055076799 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * The whole document, in particular, Table 1 and p.946, col.2, §3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jctb.2657 | [Y] - GOKARN Y R ET AL, Excipients for protein drugs, EXCIPIENT DEVELOPMENT FOR PHARMACEUTICAL, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS,, PAGE(S) 291 - 331, (20060101), XP009179656 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * The whole document, in particular the Appendix * | [Y] - SAMPATHKUMAR KRISHNAN ET AL, Formulation and Process Development Strategies for Manufacturing Biopharmaceuticals; Chapter 16: DEVELOPMENT OF FORMULATIONS FOR THERAPEUTIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND Fc FUSION PROTEINS, FORMULATION AND PROCESS DEVELOPMENT STRATEGIES FOR MANUFACTURING BIOPHARMACEUTICALS, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, HOBOKEN, N.J, PAGE(S) 383 - 427, (20100805), ISBN 978-0-470-11812-2, XP002712418 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * Thew whole document, in particular, p.403, §3 and p.411, §2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9780470595886.ch16 | [Y] - HE F ET AL, "Screening of monoclonal antibody formulations based on high-throughput thermostability and viscosity measurements: Design of experiment and statistical analysis", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 100, no. 4, doi:10.1002/JPS.22384, ISSN 0022-3549, (20110401), pages 1330 - 1340, (20101102), XP002696416 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * The whole document, in particular, Table 7, p.1338, col.§, §2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.22384 | [Y] - TIM J KAMERZELL ET AL, "Protein excipient interactions: Mechanisms and biophysical characterization applied to protein formulation development", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 63, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2011.07.006, ISSN 0169-409X, (20110726), pages 1118 - 1159, (20110729), XP028320148 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * The whole document, in particular section 1.2.2 on p.1122 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2011.07.006 | [Y] - WERNER MAEDER ET AL, "Local tolerance and stability up to 24 months of a new 20% proline-stabilized polyclonal immunoglobulin for subcutaneous administration", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, vol. 39, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BIOLOGICALS.2010.11.004, ISSN 1045-1056, (20101123), pages 43 - 49, (20101202), XP028139185 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * The whole documment, in particular Fig.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biologicals.2010.11.004 | [Y] - BOLLI R ET AL, "l-Proline reduces IgG dimer content and enhances the stability of intravenous immunoglobulin (IVIG) solutions", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, vol. 38, no. 1, ISSN 1045-1056, (20100101), pages 150 - 157, (20100306), XP026978067 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-15 * The whole document, in particular, Table 1 * | [AP] - "Case No: HP-2013-000004 Neutral Citation Number: [2014] EWHC 3857 (Pat) IN THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE CHANCERY DIVISION PATENTS COURT", Neutral Citation Number: [2014] EWHC 3857 (Pat) IN THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE CHANCERY DIVISION PATENTS COURT, (20141121), URL: http://www.aoyamapat.gr.jp/assets/editor/files/Hospira%20UK%20Ltd%20vs%20Genentech%20Inc%20EWHC%203857.pdf, (20150511), XP055188693 [AP] 13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2007053900 (LIU JUN [US], et al); | [X]WO2011104381 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [X]US2007116700 (LIU JUN [US], et al); | [X]WO2011109365 (PROGENICS PHARM INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010056657 (REGENTS THE UNIVESITY OF TEXAS [US], et al) | Examination | - MARK X YANG ET AL, "Crystalline monoclonal antibodies for subcutaneous delivery", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20030610), vol. 100, no. 12, doi:10.1073/PNAS.1131899100, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6934 - 6939, XP002717388 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.1131899100 | - STEVEN SHIRE, Stability of monoclonal antibodies mAbs, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES: MEETING THE CHALLENGES IN MANUFACTURING, FORMULATION, DELIVERY AND STABILITY OF FINAL DRUG PRO,, PAGE(S) 45 - 92, (20150101), XP009192950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-08-100296-4.00003-8 | - STEVEN SHIRE, Formulation of proteins and monoclonal antibodies mAbs, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES: MEETING THE CHALLENGES IN MANUFACTURING, FORMULATION, DELIVERY AND STABILITY OF FINAL DRUG PRO,, PAGE(S) 93 - 120, (20150101), XP009192951 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-08-100296-4.00004-X | by applicant | WO2012138958 | US2007053900 | WO2011104381 | US2007116700 | WO2011109365 | WO2010056657 | - FALCONER et al., Journal of Chemical Technology & Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 86, no. 7, pages 942 - 948 | - GOKARN et al., Excipient Development for Pharmaceutical Biotechnology and Drug Delivery Systems, (20060000), pages 291 - 331 | - SAMPATHKUMAR KRISHNAN et al., Development of Formulations for Therapeutic Monoclonal Antibodies and Fc Fusion Proteins, (20100000), pages 383 - 427 | - HE et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, American Pharmaceutical Association, (20110000), vol. 100, no. 4, pages 1330 - 1340 | - KAMERZELL et al., Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20110000), vol. 63, no. 13, pages 1118 - 1159 | - MAEDER et al., Biologicals, (20100000), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 43 - 49 | - BOLLI et al., Biologicals, (20100000), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 150 - 157 | - YANG et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, US, (20030000), vol. 100, no. 12, pages 6934 - 6939 | - SHIRE, "Monoclonal Antibodies: Meeting the Challenges in Manufacturing, Formulation", Delivery and Stability of Final Drug Pro., (20150000), pages 45 - 92,93-120 | - REUBSAET, J. L.; J. H. BEIJNEN et al., "Analytical techniques used to study the degradation of proteins and peptides: chemical instability", J Pharm Biomed Anal, (19980000), vol. 17, no. 6-7, doi:doi:10.1016/S0731-7085(98)00063-6, pages 955 - 78, XP002626964 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0731-7085(98)00063-6 | - WANG, W., "Instability, stabilization, and formulation of liquid protein pharmaceuticals", Int J Pharm, (19990000), vol. 185, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(99)00152-0, pages 129 - 88, XP002616539 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(99)00152-0 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Co. | - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, APhA Publications | - "Pharmaceutical excipients in formulations", BANGA, A.K., Therapeutic Peptides and Proteins, Formulation, Processing and Delivery Systems, CRC Press, pages 104 - 116 |