Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2748734

EP2748734 - COMPUTER SYSTEM FOR INSTRUCTING AN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (IP) FILING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inovia Holdings Pty Ltd
Suite 4 Level 12
45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / SIMPSON, Justin Ryan
c/o inovia Holdings Pty Ltd
Suite 4 Level 12
45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
02 / SELVARAJ, John Wilfred Adaikalam
c/o inovia Holdings Pty Ltd
Suite 4 Level 12
45 Clarence Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Smith, Jeremy Robert , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Smith, Jeremy Robert , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date12843901.526.10.2012
WO2012AU01307
Priority number, dateAU2011090444226.10.2011         Original published format: AU 2011904442
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013059874
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2748734
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search reportAU25.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10, G06Q50/18
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/27]G06F17/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
TitleGerman:COMPUTERSYSTEM ZUR ERKLÄRUNG DER SORTIERUNG GEISTIGEN EIGENTUMS[2014/27]
English:COMPUTER SYSTEM FOR INSTRUCTING AN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (IP) FILING[2014/27]
French:SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE POUR INSTRUIRE UN DÉPÔT DE PROPRIÉTÉ INTELLECTUELLE (PI)[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2014National basic fee paid 
28.03.2014Search fee paid 
28.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
24.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005228684  (POGODIN PAVEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1,2 *
International search[X]US2010235403  (NEY DE SOUZA PAULO [US], et al);
 [X]US6360254  (LINDEN GREGORY D [US], et al)