Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802387

EP2802387 - PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wedowski, Michael
Hans-Marchwitza-Ring 23
14474 Potsdam / DE
[2017/43]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
CHS GmbH
Strausbergerstrasse 45
10243 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WEDOWSKI, Michael
Hans-Marchwitza-Ring 23
14474 Potsdam / DE
 [2019/20]
Former [2014/47]01 / WEDOWSKI, Michael
Schillerstrasse 34
14913 Jueterbog / DE
Representative(s)Kayser, Christoph
Kayser & Cobet
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Am Borsigturm 9
13507 Berlin / DE
[2019/20]
Former [2014/47]Müller, Jochen
Patentanwälte Becker & Aue Gaustrasse 20
55411 Bingen / DE
Application number, filing date12844658.020.12.2012
[2019/20]
WO2012DE100397
Priority number, dateDE20121010017710.01.2012         Original published format: DE102012100177
DE20121010519115.06.2012         Original published format: DE102012105191
[2014/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013104351
Date:18.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2802387
Date:19.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802387
Date:15.05.2019
Language:DE
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A62C3/07, A62C35/02, A62C35/13, A62C37/36, A62C99/00, B60H1/00, A62C37/11, // A62C37/14, A62C37/16
[2018/47]
Former International [2014/47]A62C3/07, A62C35/02, A62C35/13, A62C37/16, A62C37/36, A62C99/00, B60H1/00, A62C37/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHUTZEINRICHTUNG[2014/47]
English:PROTECTION DEVICE[2014/47]
French:SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
26.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2019Fee for grant paid
25.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07