Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790429

EP2790429 - HNB OR HENB SECURITY ACCESS METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND CORE NETWORK ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/49]
Former [2014/37]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZONG, Zaifeng
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / ZHOU, Xiaoyun
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / ZHU, Li
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Bergmeier, Werner
Canzler & Bergmeier
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
[2018/49]
Former [2014/42]Bergmeier, Werner
Canzler & Bergmeier
Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
Former [2014/37]Bergmeier, Werner
Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date12844878.408.10.2012
[2018/49]
WO2012CN82555
Priority number, dateCN20111033776231.10.2011         Original published format: CN201110337762
CN20111036454904.11.2011         Original published format: CN201110364549
[2014/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013064002
Date:10.05.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790429
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790429
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN10.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W12/12, H04L9/32, // H04W88/08
[2018/31]
Former International [2015/16]H04W12/06, H04W12/12, H04L9/32, // H04W88/08
Former International [2014/37]H04W12/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR HNB- ODER HENB-SICHERHEITSZUGRIFF SOWIE NETZWERKELEMENT[2014/37]
English:HNB OR HENB SECURITY ACCESS METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND CORE NETWORK ELEMENT[2014/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS SÉCURISÉ À DES NOEUDS HNB OU HENB, ET ÉLÉMENT DE COEUR DE RÉSEAU[2014/37]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2014Translation filed 
26.03.2014National basic fee paid 
26.03.2014Search fee paid 
26.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
14.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2018Fee for grant paid
24.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.02.2017
Opposition(s)06.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/37]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[XA]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "Binding of HNB identities for CSG Verification", 3GPP DRAFT; S3-110685.ZIP:S3-110685 BINDING OF H(E)NB IDENTITIES FOR CSG VERIFICATION R7, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110703), vol. SA WG3, no. Mainz; 20110711, XP050552496 [X] 8,9,15 * abstract * * sections 1, 2 * [A] 1-7,10-14
 [XA]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "Reply to SA3 LS on CSG security for H(e)NB", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-111291-SEGW-HNB-GW-IF, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110430), vol. RAN WG3, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050498205 [X] 8,9,15 * section 2 * [A] 1-7,10-14
 [IA]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Security of Home Node B (HNB) / Home evolved Node B (HeNB) (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 33.320, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110926), vol. SA WG3, no. V11.3.0, pages 1 - 35, XP050554033 [I] 1-7,10-14 * sections 1, 4 * * sections 5.2, 7.2 * * Annex A.1 * [A] 8,9,15
International search[X]CN101795451  (ZTE CORP.);
 [A]CN101784051  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN101442402  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN101715177  (ZTE CORP.)