Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2774705

EP2774705 - CUTTING INSERT, CUTTING TOOL, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CUTTING WORKPIECE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMICHI, Kazuki
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Head Office
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12845723.130.05.2012
WO2012JP63987
Priority number, dateJP2011023960631.10.2011         Original published format: JP 2011239606
[2014/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013065347
Date:10.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2774705
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23C5/20, B23B27/14, B23B27/22, B23C5/06
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDEINSATZ, SCHNEIDEWERKZEUG SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES SCHNEIDWERKSTÜCKS DAMIT[2014/37]
English:CUTTING INSERT, CUTTING TOOL, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CUTTING WORKPIECE USING SAME[2014/37]
French:INSERT TRANCHANT, OUTIL TRANCHANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PIÈCE USINÉE TRANCHANTE LES UTILISANT[2014/37]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2014Translation filed 
25.04.2014National basic fee paid 
25.04.2014Search fee paid 
25.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
21.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
17.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1736266  (HORN P HARTMETALL WERKZEUGFAB [DE]) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0012]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-11;
 [Y]US6786682  (WIMAN JOERGEN [SE]) [Y] 2-11 * column 2, line 44 - line 62; figure - *;
 [A]JP2004090198  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007071559  (KOSKINEN JORMA [SE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016]; figure - *;
 [A]US2010034602  (SUNG WOOK JUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figure - *
International search[Y]WO2011122676  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2002046010  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP);
 [Y]JPH09117817  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP);
 [Y]WO2007142224  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2010523352  (ESKAR LTD.);
 [A]JP2004090198  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP)
by applicantJP2004314301