EP2773199 - INHIBITORS OF THE RENAL OUTER MEDULLARY POTASSIUM CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALSH, Shawn, P. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
PASTERNAK, Alexander 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
DEJESUS, Reynalda, K. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
TANG, Haifeng 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
PIO, Barbara 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
SHAHRIPOUR, Aurash 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
BELYK, Kevin, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 08 /
CHOBANIAN, Harry, R. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 09 /
GUO, Yan 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 10 /
FRIE, Jessica, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 11 /
SHI, Zhi-Cai 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 12 /
CHEN, Helen 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 13 /
BLIZZARD, Timothy, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 14 /
CATO, Brian 209 Sandcastle Key Secaucus, New Jersey 07094 / US | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2014/37] | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12845954.2 | 25.10.2012 | [2019/15] | WO2012US61884 | Priority number, date | US201161553374P | 31.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161553374 P | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013066714 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2773199 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2773199 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07D405/14, C07D407/12, C07D409/12, C07D471/08, C07D487/08, C07D487/18, C07D498/08, A61K31/496, A61K31/499, A61K31/4995, A61P7/10, A61P9/04, A61P9/12 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,US);
C07D487/18 (EP,US);
C07D491/08 (EP,US);
C07D498/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/37] | A01N29/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DES RENALEN KALIUMKANALS DER ÄUSSEREN MEDULLA | [2014/37] | English: | INHIBITORS OF THE RENAL OUTER MEDULLARY POTASSIUM CHANNEL | [2014/37] | French: | INHIBITEURS DU CANAL POTASSIQUE MÉDULLAIRE EXTERNE RÉNAL | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2012 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | IT | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | IE | 25.10.2019 | LU | 25.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 25.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 25.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 25.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.10.2019 | ||
LU | 25.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010129379 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,10-12,16-24 * the whole document *; | [YP]WO2012058134 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [YP] 1-3,10-12,16-24 * the whole document; in particular, (i) claim 1,and the examples 210-212 and 217 on pages 196-197, and (ii) claim 1, in particular, the definition of R9 and R7 forming a ring * | International search | [X]WO2010129379 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [X]US2010286123 (PASTERNAK ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [XP]WO2012058116 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [A]US2010093634 (WELLING PAUL A [US], et al); | [Y] - LEE ET AL., "Functional and structural characterization of PKA-mediated pHi gating of ROMK1 channels", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR GRAPHICS AND MODELLING, (2008), vol. 27, pages 332 - 341, XP055066297 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmgm.2008.06.001 | [A] - LEWIS ET AL., "High-Throughput Screening Reveals a Small-Molecule Inhibitor of the Renal Outer Medullary Potassium Channel and Kir7.1", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2009), vol. 76, pages 1094 - 1103, XP009135107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.109.059840 | [A] - WELLING ET AL., "A comprehensive guide to the ROMK potassium channel: form and function in health and disease", AM J PHYSIOL RENAL PHYSIOL, (2009), vol. 297, pages F849 - F863, XP055068160 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajprenal.00181.2009 | by applicant | WO2010129379 | US5116835 | US5095119 | US5104869 | US5114937 | US5106835 | US5063208 | US4845079 | US5089471 | US5071837 | US5064965 | US5063207 | US5036054 | US5036053 | US5034512 | US4894437 | US5098924 | US5055466 | US4885292 | US5075451 | US4980283 | US5066643 | WO2011025690 | - HO, K. et al., "Cloning and expression of an inwardly rectifying A TP-regulated potassium channel", Nature, (19930000), vol. 362, no. 6415, doi:doi:10.1038/362031a0, pages 31.8.1 - 31.8.2, XP002030879 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/362031a0 | - SHUCK, M.E. et al., "Cloning and characterization of multiple forms of the human kidney ROM-K potassium channel", J Biol Chem, (19940000), vol. 269, no. 39, pages 24261 - 70, XP000941647 | - HEBERT, S.C. et al., "Molecular diversity and regulation of renal potassium channels", Physiol Rev, (20050000), vol. 85, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1152/physrev.00051.2003, pages 319 - 713, XP055458873 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physrev.00051.2003 | - REINALTER, S.C. et al., "Pharmacotyping ofhypokalaemic salt-losing tubular disorders", Acta Physiol Scand, (20040000), vol. 181, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-201X.2004.01325.x, pages 513 - 21, XP055458892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-201X.2004.01325.x | - WANG, W., "Renal potassium channels: recent developments", Curr Opin Nephrol Hypertens, (20040000), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1097/00041552-200409000-00011, pages 549 - 55, XP009504083 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00041552-200409000-00011 | - LIFTON, R.P.; A.G. GHARAVI; D.S. GELLER, "Molecular mechanisms of human hypertension", Cell, (20010000), vol. 104, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00241-0, pages 545 - 56, XP055458895 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00241-0 | - JI, W. et al., "Rare independent mutations in renal salt handling genes contribute to blood pressure variation", Nat Genet, (20080000), vol. 40, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/ng.118, pages 592 - 9, XP055458896 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.118 | - TOBIN, M.D. et al., "Common variants in genes underlying monogenic hypertension and hypotension and blood pressure in the general population", Hypertension, (20080000), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.108.112664, pages 1658 - 64, XP055458899 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.108.112664 | - LORENZ, J.N. et al., "Impaired renal NaCl absorption in mice lacking the ROMK potassium channel, a model for type II Bartter's syndrome", J Biol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, no. 40, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M205627200, pages 37871 - 80, XP055458903 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M205627200 | - LU, M. et al., "Absence of small conductance K+ channel (SK) activity in apical membranes of thick ascending limb and cortical collecting duct in ROMK (Bartter's) knockout mice", J Biol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, no. 40, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M206644200, pages 37881 - 7, XP055458906 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M206644200 | - LEWIS, L.M. et al., "High-Throughput Screening Reveals a Small-Molecule Inhibitor of the Renal Outer Medullary Potassium Channel and Kir7.1", Mol Pharmacol, (20090000), vol. 76, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1124/mol.109.059840, pages 1094 - 1103, XP009135107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.109.059840 | - HAMILL, Pfluegers Archives, (19810000), vol. 391, pages 85 - 100 |